EP0437153 - Process and device for continuous casting of metal matrix composite bodies reinforced by refractory ceramic particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.03.1992 [1992/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PECHINEY RECHERCHE (Groupement d'Intérêt Economique régi par l'ordonnance du 23 Septembre 1967) Immeuble Balzac, 10, place des Vosges 92400 Courbevoie la Défense 5 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | For all designated states PECHINEY RECHERCHE (Groupement d'Intérêt Economique régi par l'Ordonnance du 23 Septembre 1967) Immeuble Balzac 10, place des Vosges F-92400 Courbevoie, La Défense 5 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Jean-Luc 25 Bd. du Guillon F-38500 Voiron / FR | 02 /
Jouet-Pastre, Laurent 23 Bd. Maréchal Leclerc F-38000 Grenoble / FR | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Jacquet, Michel, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel 69433 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | Jacquet, Michel, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420579.6 | 28.12.1990 | [1991/29] | Priority number, date | FR19900000515 | 04.01.1990 Original published format: FR 9000515 | [1991/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0437153 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/10, B22D11/00 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
B22D11/115 (EP);
B22D11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1991/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Stranggiessen von mit feuerfesten Keramikteilchen verstärkte Metallmatrixverbundwerkstoffkörpern | [1991/29] | English: | Process and device for continuous casting of metal matrix composite bodies reinforced by refractory ceramic particles | [1991/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la coulée continue de composites à matrice métallique renforcée par des particules d'un matériau céramique réfractaire | [1991/29] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 31.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/39] | 15.01.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2013542 (CONCAST AG); | [A]US4200137 (GEORGE MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [Y]EP0069270 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE], et al); | [A]EP0086637 (BRITISH STEEL CORP [GB]); | [A]US4473103 (KENNEY MALACHI P [US], et al); | [Y]WO8912515 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) |