Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] |
17.06.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] |
18.12.1991 | First examination report | |
23.11.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] |
28.06.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] |