Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0441083 | Global Dossier | 04.08.1993 | B1 | EP0441083 | 14.08.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9001852 | 09.02.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2035769 | 10.08.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9001852 | 09.02.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69002609T | 17.02.1994 | T2 | DE69002609D1 | 09.09.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9001852 | 09.02.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2044515T | 01.01.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9001852 | 09.02.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2658217 | 09.06.1995 | B1 | FR2658217 | 16.08.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9001852 | 09.02.1990 |