EP0441083 - Prefabricated concrete monobloc elements for the construction of retaining walls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brot, Louis La Calade F-04860 Pierrevert / FR | [1991/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/33] | Representative(s) | Moretti, René, et al c/o Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado 13008 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | Moretti, René, et al c/o Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE "Prado-Mermoz" 232, Avenue du Prado F-13008 Marseille / FR | Application number, filing date | 90430027.4 | 28.12.1990 | [1991/33] | Priority number, date | FR19900001852 | 09.02.1990 Original published format: FR 9001852 | [1991/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0441083 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0441083 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/02, E04C1/39, E01F8/00, E04B1/84 | [1991/33] | CPC: |
E01F8/0035 (EP);
E01F8/023 (EP);
E02D29/025 (EP);
E04B1/8404 (EP);
E04C1/395 (EP);
E04B2001/8476 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1991/33] | Title | German: | Einstückige Betonfestigteile für die Herstellung von Stützmauern | [1991/33] | English: | Prefabricated concrete monobloc elements for the construction of retaining walls | [1991/33] | French: | Eléments monoblocs en béton préfabriqué pour la construction de murs de soutènement | [1991/33] | Examination procedure | 16.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/03] | 19.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 04.08.1993 | [2015/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB191509474 ; | [Y]US2296699 ; | [A]US2933146 ; | [AD]EP0319465 ; | [A]US4860505 |