EP0397585 - Fastening-tab for a tilt-over-door of an inspection cover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tavoschi, Fulvio 13 bis, rue de Velotte F-25000 Besancon / FR | [1990/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | Metz, Paul Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063 67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Metz, Paul CABINET METZ PATNI 63, rue de la Ganzau B.P. 63 F-67024 Strasbourg Cédex 1 / FR | ||
Former [1990/46] | Metz, Paul Cabinet METZ PATNI 63, rue de la Ganzau B.P. 63 F-67024 Strasbourg Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90440038.9 | 09.05.1990 | [1990/46] | Priority number, date | FR19890006222 | 09.05.1989 Original published format: FR 8906222 | [1990/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0397585 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0397585 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E04F19/08, A47K3/16 | [1990/46] | CPC: |
A47K3/1615 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1990/46] | Title | German: | Kipptürbefestigungslasche einer Revisionsabdeckung | [1990/46] | English: | Fastening-tab for a tilt-over-door of an inspection cover | [1990/46] | French: | Patte de fixation à effet de basculement pour le portillon d'une trappe de visite | [1990/46] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 03.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 10.06.1992 | NL | 10.06.1992 | SE | 10.06.1992 | [1998/15] |
Former [1993/03] | NL | 10.06.1992 | |
SE | 10.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2161533 (TAVOSCHI FULVIO); | [A]DE2512094 (TAVOSCHI FULVIO); | [A]FR2364320 (SCHLUETER WERNER [DE]); | [A]FR2462138 (TAVOSCHI FULVIO [FR]); | [A]FR2539441 (TAVOSCHI FULVIO [FR]); | [A]DE3544859 (ROTH ECKART [DE]); | [A]DE8711829U |