EP0442239 - Machine for unstacking sheet material, more particularly glass sheets with polished, chamfered or rounded edges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VTF INDUSTRIES, S.A.R.L. 43, rue de la Libération F-57870 Troisfontaines / FR | [1991/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Winger, Gabriel 8, rue Saint-Nicolas F-57870 Walscheid / FR | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Nuss, Pierre, et al 10, rue Jacques Kablé F-67080 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90440129.6 | 28.12.1990 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | FR19900002316 | 15.02.1990 Original published format: FR 9002316 | [1991/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442239 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0442239 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65G59/08, B65G49/06 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
B65G49/068 (EP);
B65G59/08 (EP);
B65G2249/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1991/34] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Entstapeln von Platten, insbesondere von Glasscheiben mit geschliffenen schrägen oder abgerundeten Kanten | [1991/34] | English: | Machine for unstacking sheet material, more particularly glass sheets with polished, chamfered or rounded edges | [1991/34] | French: | Machine à dépiler des plaques, en particulier des plaques de verre à bords taillés chanfreinés ou arrondis | [1991/34] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 29.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 02.03.1994 | [1995/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3012752 ; | [A]US4093083 ; | [A]FR923939 ; | [A]US3612251 ; | [A]DE8707402U |