Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] |
05.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
03.01.1996 | Change - representative | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] |
19.07.1995 | First examination report | |
13.08.1992 | Publication of search report | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] |
22.12.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] |
08.09.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.10.1990 [1990/43] |