Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
03.09.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
20.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] |
29.01.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] |
06.12.1991 | First examination report | |
30.11.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] |
21.07.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.09.1990 [1990/36] |