Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0385913 | Global Dossier | 17.03.1993 | B1 | EP0385913 | 05.09.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30467689 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2007958 | 10.08.1999 | C | CA2007958 | 01.08.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30467689 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE385913T | 02.05.1991 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US30467689 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69001082T | 24.06.1993 | T2 | DE69001082D1 | 22.04.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US30467689 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3191931B | 23.07.2001 | B2 | JPH03197299 | 28.08.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US30467689 | 01.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4941803 | 17.07.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US30467689 | 01.02.1989 |