EP0385913 - Airfoiled blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wainauski, Harry S. 38 Alder Road Simsbury, Connecticut 06070 / US | 02 /
Vaczy, Carol M. 59 Jessie Street Swampscott, Massachusetts 01907 / US | [1990/36] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 90630029.8 | 01.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | US19890304676 | 01.02.1989 Original published format: US 304676 | [1990/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0385913 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0385913 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B64C11/18 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
B64C11/18 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US);
Y10S416/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/36] | Title | German: | Profilierter Propellerflügel | [1990/36] | English: | Airfoiled blade | [1990/36] | French: | Ailette d'hélice profilée | [1990/36] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/03] | 10.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.03.1993 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4519746 (WAINAUSKI HARRY S [US], et al); | [A]EP0103478 (GILCHRIST IAN JAMES [US], et al); | [A]US4630787 (MIDDLEBROOK DARYL L [US]); | [AP]US4830574 (WAINAUSKI HARRY S [US], et al) |