EP0426606 - Short dwell coater apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1996 | Opposition rejected | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3513 Concord Pike, Suite 3001 Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/15] | For all designated states BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 3513 Concord Pike, Suite 3001 Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | ||
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states BELOIT CORPORATION P.O. Box 350 Beloit Wisconsin 53511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busker, Leroy Henry 571 West Rockton Road Rockton, Illinois / US | 02 /
Wight, Ernest William 10822 Bayberry Roscoe, Illinois / US | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [1991/19] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 90630176.7 | 11.10.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | US19890429260 | 30.10.1989 Original published format: US 429260 | [1991/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0426606 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0426606 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426606 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B05C3/18, B05C11/04, B05C11/10 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
B05C3/18 (EP,KR,US);
B05C5/02 (KR);
B05C11/04 (EP,US);
B05C11/041 (EP,US);
B05C11/10 (EP,US);
D21H23/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/19] | Title | German: | Auftragsvorrichtung mit kurzer Auftragszeit | [1991/19] | English: | Short dwell coater apparatus | [1991/19] | French: | Applicateur à court temps d'application | [1991/19] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/21] | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.03.1995
30.03.1995
ADMISSIBLE Voith Sulzer Papiermaschinen GmbH Postfach 19 70 D-89520 Heidenheim / DE | [1995/19] | 02.05.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.11.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.06.1996 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 27.06.1996 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1996/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3614582 (WILL E C H GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]FR2564009 (WAERTSILAE OY AB [FI]); | [A]US4452833 (HOLT SHERWOOD G [US]); | [A]US4867097 (FOLTZ JOHN R [US]) |