EP0468125 - Manufacture of high frequency horns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8100 W. Florissant Avenue St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8100 W. Florissant Avenue St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klein, Kevin Joseph 352 South Street Roxbury, Connecticut 06783 / US | [1992/05] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1992/05] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 90630257.5 | 21.12.1990 | [1992/05] | Priority number, date | US19900558232 | 26.07.1990 Original published format: US 558232 | [1992/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0468125 | Date: | 29.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0468125 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B06B3/00 | [1992/05] | CPC: |
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
B06B3/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/80 (EP,US);
B29C66/9512 (EP,US);
B29C66/81463 (EP,US);
B29C66/9513 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/81463, B29C65/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/05] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Hochfrequenzschalltrichter | [1992/05] | English: | Manufacture of high frequency horns | [1992/05] | French: | Fabrication des hornes de haute fréquence | [1992/05] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/19] | 12.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.10.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1597010 (SCHOELLER & CO ELEKTROTECH); | [AD]US3113225 (CLAUS KLEESATTEL, et al) |