EP0433214 - Gas pressure regulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1995 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co. Berghauser Strasse 40 Postfach 10 10 61 42810 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co. Berghauser Strasse 40 Postfach 10 10 61 D-42810 Remscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eiben, Frank Kornharpener Strasse 122a W-4630 Bochum 1 / DE | 02 /
Friedrichs, Detlef Brüder-Grimm-Strasse 52 W-5609 Hückeswagen / DE | 03 /
Marrek, Lothar Hasenpfad 14 W-5632 Wermelskirchen / DE | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Heim, Johann-Ludwig C/o Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Postfach 10 10 20 42810 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Heim, Johann-Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Joh. Vaillant GmbH u. Co Postfach 10 10 20 D-42810 Remscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 90710035.8 | 12.12.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | AT19890002807 | 12.12.1989 Original published format: AT 280789 | [1991/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0433214 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0433214 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F23N1/08 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
F23N1/007 (EP);
F23N1/087 (EP);
F23N2225/08 (EP);
F23N2235/16 (EP);
F23N2235/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/25] | Title | German: | Gasdruckregler | [1991/25] | English: | Gas pressure regulator | [1991/25] | French: | Régulateur de pression de gaz | [1991/25] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 08.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 16.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/30] | 24.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP58024756 [ ]; | [X]US3827849 (NELSON L); | [Y]AT384098B (VAILLANT GMBH [AT]); | [X]DE3007214 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]FR880639 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 104 (M-212)(1249), 6. Mai 1983; & JP,A,58 024 756 (YOUEI SEISAKUSHO) 14-02-1983, zusammenfassung., & JP58024756 A 00000000 |