EP0399955 - Locking element for securing a cover to a frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poly-Bauelemente AG Webereistrasse 47 8134 Adliswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states Poly-Bauelemente AG Webereistrasse 47 CH-8134 Adliswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomann, Roland A. Hehlstrasse 6 CH-8135 Langnau / CH | 02 /
Witschi, Heinz Am Luzerbach 9 CH-6043 Adligenswil / CH | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Justitz-Wormser, Daisy Pauline, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | Justitz-Wormser, Daisy P., Dipl.-Chem., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1990/48] | Justitz-Wormser, Daisy P., Dipl.-Chem. Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 90810365.8 | 18.05.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | CH19890001972 | 25.05.1989 Original published format: CH 197289 | CH19890004337 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: CH 433789 | [1990/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0399955 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0399955 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0399955 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E03F5/06 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
E03F5/06 (EP);
E03F2005/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Verschlusselement zur Sicherung eines Deckels an einem Rahmen | [1990/48] | English: | Locking element for securing a cover to a frame | [1990/48] | French: | Elément de fermeture pour verrouiller un couvercle dans un cadre | [1990/48] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 22.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 06.08.1997 | GR | 06.08.1997 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/30] | DK | 06.08.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1813788 (PASSAVANT WERKE); | [A]US3816882 (MAEDA K, et al); | [X]FR2456169 (MOREL ATEL ELECTROMEC) | Examination | DE3526535 | DE8717057U | EP0345222 |