Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0407335 | Global Dossier | 22.12.1993 | B1 | EP0407335 | 09.01.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH254489 | 07.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH681635 | 30.04.1993 | A5 | Priority number | Date | CH254489 | 07.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59003941D1 | 03.02.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH254489 | 07.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0345739 | 27.02.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | CH254489 | 07.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU1814667 | 07.05.1993 | C | Priority number | Date | CH254489 | 07.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5050644 | 24.09.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | CH254489 | 07.07.1989 |