EP0408505 - Computerized sewing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEFINA S.A. 5a Boulevard de Pérolles CH-1700 Fribourg / CH | [1991/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tschopp, Gérard c/o Dussex, 10, rue du Contrat-Social CH-1203 Geneve / CH | 02 /
Buchilly, Claude 15, rue des Deux Marchés CH-1800 Vevey / CH | 03 /
Kohli, Christian Robert 14B, route de Jussy CH-1226 Thonex / CH | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Dousse, Blasco, et al 73, Avenue de Mategin 1217 Meyrin-Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Dousse, Blasco, et al 7, route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 90810510.9 | 05.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | CH19890002580 | 11.07.1989 Original published format: CH 258089 | [1991/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0408505 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0408505 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/405, G05B19/10 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
G05B19/108 (EP,US);
D05B19/00 (KR);
D05B19/10 (EP,US);
G05B19/408 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36096 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45195 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/03] | Title | German: | Rechnergesteuerte Nähmaschine | [1991/03] | English: | Computerized sewing machine | [1991/03] | French: | Machine à coudre informatisée | [1991/03] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4413574 (HIROTA KUNIO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0147087 (NAKANIHON SYSTEM CO LTD [JP], et al); | [AD]US4660488 (HANYU SUSUMU [JP], et al) |