Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] |
14.01.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] |
05.08.1993 | First examination report | |
26.04.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.1991 [1991/25] |
01.12.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.01.1991 [1991/03] |