EP0425435 - Process for trichromic dyeing or printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walter, Harald, Dr. Rufacherstrasse 20 CH-4055 Basel / CH | [1991/18] | Application number, filing date | 90810790.7 | 16.10.1990 | [1991/18] | Priority number, date | CH19890003827 | 23.10.1989 Original published format: CH 382789 | [1991/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0425435 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D06P3/24, D06P3/06, C09B67/00 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
C09B67/0046 (EP,US);
D06P3/06 (EP,US);
D06P3/241 (EP,US);
Y10S8/917 (US);
Y10S8/924 (US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Trichromie-Färben oder -Bedrucken | [1991/18] | English: | Process for trichromic dyeing or printing | [1991/18] | French: | Procédé de teinture ou d'impression trichromique | [1991/18] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/18] | 01.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/44] | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0083299 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0092512 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [YD]EP0127579 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [YD]EP0181292 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [XP]EP0388353 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |