EP0427666 - Coffee machine for selectively making espresso coffee or filter coffee [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESTRO S.R.L. Via Monte Grappa 7 I-24100 Bergamo / IT | [1991/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willi, Marco Bahnhofstrasse 66 CH-8620 Wetzikon / CH | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Gartenstrasse 28 A 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | Rottmann, Maximilian R. c/o Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 90810809.5 | 23.10.1990 | [1991/20] | Priority number, date | DE19893937000 | 07.11.1989 Original published format: DE 3937000 | [1991/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0427666 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0427666 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/36, A47J31/54 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
A47J31/36 (EP,US);
A47J31/545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/20] | Title | German: | Kaffeemaschine zur wahlweisen Zubereitung von Espresso-Kaffee oder Filterkaffee | [1991/20] | English: | Coffee machine for selectively making espresso coffee or filter coffee | [1991/20] | French: | Machine à café pour préparer au choix du café expresso ou du café filtre | [1991/20] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 04.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1429976 (JEDLICKA HELMUT); | [AD]FR1563536 ; | [A]EP0004659 (TURMIX AG [CH]); | [A]US4309939 (STOVER KENNETH W); | [A]EP0073496 (PATZNER GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]EP0084489 (POCACHARD & CIE [FR]); | [A]GB2139481 (WMF WUERTTEMBERG METALLWAREN) |