EP0427673 - Conveyor device, in particular for conveying concrete and/or bulk material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMIL GISLER AG MASCHINENBAU UND HYDRAULIK Kohlplatzstrasse 15 CH-6462 Seedorf / CH | [1991/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gisler, Emil Kohlplatzstrasse 16 CH-6462 Seedorf / CH | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Keller, René, et al Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Zeughausgasse 5 Postfach 3000 Bern 7 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | Keller, René, Dr., et al Keller & Partner Patentanwälte AG Marktgasse 31 Postfach CH-3000 Bern 7 / CH | Application number, filing date | 90810840.0 | 01.11.1990 | [1991/20] | Priority number, date | CH19890004011 | 07.11.1989 Original published format: CH 401189 | [1991/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0427673 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0427673 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65G21/14, B65G41/00, E04G21/04 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
E04G21/04 (EP);
B65G21/14 (EP);
B65G41/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/20] | Title | German: | Fördereinrichtung, insbesondere zur Förderung von Beton und Schüttgut | [1991/20] | English: | Conveyor device, in particular for conveying concrete and/or bulk material | [1991/20] | French: | Dispositif de transport en particulier pour le transport de béton ou de la matière en vrac | [1991/20] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.07.1994 | FR | 27.07.1994 | GB | 27.07.1994 | IT | 27.07.1994 | NL | 27.07.1994 | AT | 01.11.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
GB | 27.07.1994 | ||
IT | 27.07.1994 | ||
NL | 27.07.1994 | ||
AT | 01.11.1994 | ||
FR | 23.12.1994 | ||
Former [1996/14] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
GB | 27.07.1994 | ||
NL | 27.07.1994 | ||
AT | 01.11.1994 | ||
FR | 23.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/37] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
GB | 27.07.1994 | ||
NL | 27.07.1994 | ||
FR | 23.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/28] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
NL | 27.07.1994 | ||
FR | 23.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
NL | 27.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | BE | 27.07.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1146895 (BERNHARD WESTBROCK); | [A]DE1556727 (WESERHUETTE AG EISENWERK); | [A]GB1271008 (ROSSI LIONELLO [IT]); | [A]US3826353 (GREASLEY C); | [A]DE2520565 (BEUMER MASCHF BERNHARD); | [A]FR2507529 (ROSSI LIONELLO [IT]); | [A]GB2136753 (SMITH DONALD LACEY) |