EP0444381 - Metal hip socket which can be fitted without cement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Sulzer Aktiengesellschaft Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | For all designated states Protek AG Erlenauweg 17 3110 Münsingen-Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/08] | For all designated states GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
For all designated states PROTEK AG Erlenauweg 17 CH-3110 Münsingen-Bern / CH | |||
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
For all designated states PROTEK AG Seftigenstrasse 356 CH-3084 Wabern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Heinz, Prof. Dr.-med., Orthopädische Kl. Wichernhaus, Krankenhaus Rummelsberg W-8501 Schwarzenbruch / DE | 02 /
Koch, Rudolf Oberdorfstrasse 229 CH-8267 Berlingen / CH | 03 /
Willi, Roland Unterdorfstrasse 24 CH-8543 Stadel / CH | [1991/36] | Application number, filing date | 90810950.7 | 05.12.1990 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | CH19900000642 | 01.03.1990 Original published format: CH 64290 | [1991/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444381 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444381 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/34 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
A61F2/30744 (EP);
A61F2/34 (EP);
A61F2002/30299 (EP);
A61F2002/30332 (EP);
A61F2002/30337 (EP);
A61F2002/30349 (EP);
A61F2002/30405 (EP);
A61F2002/305 (EP);
A61F2002/30563 (EP);
A61F2002/3241 (EP);
A61F2002/3403 (EP);
A61F2002/3414 (EP);
A61F2002/3462 (EP);
A61F2220/0025 (EP);
A61F2220/0033 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/36] | Title | German: | Zementfrei einzusetzende metallische Hüftgelenkspfanne | [1991/36] | English: | Metal hip socket which can be fitted without cement | [1991/36] | French: | Prothèse d'acétabule métallique destinée à être fixée sans ciment | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 17.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4524467 (DECARLO JR ALFRED F [US]); | [A]US4695282 (FORTE MARK R [US], et al); | [AD]EP0298234 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]EP0313762 (SULZER AG [CH], et al) |