EP0433233 - Heterocyclic compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states DR. R. MAAG AG CH-8157 Dielsdorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trah, Stephan, Dr. 8 Erlenweg W-7800 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | 02 /
Gantz, François 6, Rue des Bosquets W-68170 Rixheim / FR | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Roth, Bernhard Max, et al Novartis AG Geistiges Eigentum Konzern 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Roth, Bernhard M., et al Patentabteilung der CIBA-Geigy AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 90810952.3 | 05.12.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | CH19890004499 | 14.12.1989 Original published format: CH 449989 | [1991/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0433233 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0433233 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/60, A01N43/12 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
C07D409/06 (EP,US);
C07D333/54 (KR);
A01N43/12 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/74 (EP,US);
C07D333/60 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/04 (EP,US);
C07D413/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1994/30] |
Former [1991/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Heterocyclische Verbindungen | [1991/25] | English: | Heterocyclic compounds | [1991/25] | French: | Composés hétérocycliques | [1991/25] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 03.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4816476 (KLAUS MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [A]EP0342459 (BASF AG [DE]) |