EP0383732 - An activity sensor, particularly for heart pacemakers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/34] | An activity sensor, particularly for haert pacemakers | ||
[1990/38] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.04.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SORIN BIOMEDICA CARDIO S.p.A. Corso Marconi 20 10125 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | For all designated states SORIN BIOMEDICA CARDIO S.p.A. Corso Marconi 20 I-10125 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states SORIN BIOMEDICA S.p.A. Strada per Crescentino I-13040 Saluggia (Vercelli) / IT | ||
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states SORIN BIOMEDICA S.p.A. Strada per Crescentino I-13040 Saluggia (Vercelli) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inguaggiato, Bruno Via Cappellini 16 I-20124 Milano / IT | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano, et al C/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 90830043.7 | 06.02.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | IT19890067085 | 13.02.1989 Original published format: IT 6708589 | [1990/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0383732 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0383732 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0383732 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36, H01H29/22 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
A61N1/36542 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/34] | A61N1/365, A61N1/37 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/34] | Title | German: | Aktivitätsdetektor, besonders für Herzschrittmacher | [1990/34] | English: | An activity sensor, particularly for heart pacemakers | [1990/38] | French: | Détecteur d'activité en particulier pour stimulateur cardiaque | [1990/34] |
Former [1990/34] | An activity sensor, particularly for haert pacemakers | Examination procedure | 25.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 14.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.05.1996
24.05.1996
ADMISSIBLE BIOTRONIK Mess- und Therapiegeräte GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin Woermannkehre 1 D-12359 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Christiansen, Henning Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | [1996/27] | 17.06.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.12.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.12.1997 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1998/21] | 04.12.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.12.1997 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 09.08.1995 | DK | 09.08.1995 | LI | 09.08.1995 | SE | 09.11.1995 | LU | 29.02.1996 | [2000/06] |
Former [1998/15] | CH | 09.08.1995 | |
DK | 09.08.1995 | ||
LI | 09.08.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | CH | 09.08.1995 | |
LI | 09.08.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | SE | 09.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2863014 (DEER JAMES W, et al); | [A]US4099040 (BITKO SHELDON S); | [A]US4628161 (THACKREY JAMES D [US]); | [A]DE3709073 (ALT ECKHARD [DE]) |