EP0391863 - Seaming equipment for securing the ends of tins, cans and similar metal containers, in particular cans for foodstuff [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.1993 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.1993 [1993/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WEMEX ITALIA S.P.A. Centro Direz. Comm.le, Milanofiori/Palazzo C4 I-20090 Milano / IT | [1990/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zago, Ennio 3a Traversa a destra di Via Libertà No. 15 I-80055 Portici Napoli / IT | [1990/41] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Rome Office Via Sallustiana, 15 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o Bugnion S.p.A. Piazza dei Re di Roma, 21 I-00183 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 90830136.9 | 02.04.1990 | [1990/41] | Priority number, date | IT19890047813 | 04.04.1989 Original published format: IT 4781389 | [1990/41] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0391863 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/32 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
B21D51/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/41] | Title | German: | Falzwerkzeug zum Befestigen der Deckel von Büchsen, Dosen und ähnlichen Behältern, insbesondere von Behältern für Lebensmittel | [1990/41] | English: | Seaming equipment for securing the ends of tins, cans and similar metal containers, in particular cans for foodstuff | [1990/41] | French: | Machine à sertir les couvercles de boîtes métalliques et conteneurs similaires, en particulier de boîtes à conserves | [1990/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/15] | 24.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/27] | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2727481 (ED LAXO); | [Y]US3245372 (KARL BOFINGER, et al) |