EP0396521 - Apparatus and method for loading electronic component carrier tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gill, Elmer Junior 7866 Lakewood Drive Austin, Texas 78750 / US | 02 /
Hunt, Ronald Eugene 211 Buck Bend Georgetown, Texas 78628 / US | 03 /
Whitehead, Verlon Eugene 8815 Mesa Drive Austin, Texas 78759 / US | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Burt, Roger James, Dr., et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1993/20] | Blakemore, Frederick Norman IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1990/45] | Johansson, Lars E. IBM Svenska AB, SW Intellectual Property Dept. S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 90850151.3 | 24.04.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | US19890347691 | 05.05.1989 Original published format: US 347691 | [1990/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0396521 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0396521 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0396521 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/02, H01L21/00 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
H05K13/021 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/45] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Laden von elektronischen Komponentenbehältertuben | [1990/45] | English: | Apparatus and method for loading electronic component carrier tubes | [1990/45] | French: | Appareil et méthode de charge de tubes contenant des composants électroniques | [1990/45] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3080092 (ZDANIS JOHN S); | [A]US4194865 (BANDOH KAZUO [JP]) |