Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0396521
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.06.1995 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] |
17.06.1994 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] |
17.08.1993 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.10.1993 [1993/40] |
01.04.1993 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] |
20.11.1992 |
First examination report |
|
04.09.1991 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] |
04.09.1991 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] |
28.06.1991 |
Publication of search report |
published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] |
22.12.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] |
22.09.1990 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.11.1990 [1990/45] |