Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0396521 | Global Dossier | 03.08.1994 | B1 | EP0396521 | 21.08.1991 | A3 | EP0396521 | 07.11.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US34769189 | 05.05.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69011184T | 09.03.1995 | T2 | DE69011184D1 | 08.09.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US34769189 | 05.05.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07121724B | 25.12.1995 | B2 | JPH0329704 | 07.02.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US34769189 | 05.05.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4974390 | 04.12.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US34769189 | 05.05.1989 |