EP0399978 - Method and apparatus for overwriting data on a magneto-optic disk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Makansi, Tarek 74 Peters Avenue Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Burt, Roger James, Dr., et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1992/26] | Killgren, Neil Arthur IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1990/48] | Johansson, Lars E. IBM Svenska AB, SW Intellectual Property Dept. S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 90850199.2 | 21.05.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | US19890357511 | 25.05.1989 Original published format: US 357511 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0399978 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0399978 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0399978 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
G11B11/10521 (EP,US);
G11B11/10508 (EP,US);
G11B11/10513 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Überschreiben von Daten auf eine magneto-optische Platte | [1996/01] | English: | Method and apparatus for overwriting data on a magneto-optic disk | [1990/48] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la surécriture de données sur un disque optique | [1990/48] |
Former [1990/48] | Verfahren und Gerät zum Überschreiben von Daten auf eine magneto-optische Scheibe | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.01.1996 | GB | 21.05.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [1997/17] | GB | 21.05.1996 | |
FR | 31.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | FR | 31.05.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62173606 ; | [A]EP0243656 (IBM [US]); | [X]EP0312143 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 16 (P-656)(2363) & JP-A-62 173 606 ( SONY CORP. ), & JP62173606 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0275323 |