EP0429421 - A phase-locked loop having a variable bandwidth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON Patent and Trademark Department 126 25 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON Patent and Trademark Department S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dent, Paul Wilkinson Apartment 201 F, Hyde Park Court Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | Lövgren, Tage, et al Ericsson AB Licensing & Patents Torhamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | Lövgren, Tage, et al Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson Patent Department S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 90850341.0 | 17.10.1990 | [1991/22] | Priority number, date | SE19890003799 | 13.11.1989 Original published format: SE 8903799 | [1991/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0429421 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0429421 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/107 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
H03L7/0893 (EP,US);
H03L7/1075 (EP,US);
H03L2207/04 (EP,US);
H03L7/0898 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/22] | Title | German: | Phasenverriegelschleife mit variabler Bandbreite | [1991/22] | English: | A phase-locked loop having a variable bandwidth | [1991/22] | French: | Boucle à phase bloquée à largeur de bande variable | [1991/22] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 10.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.1995 | BE | 22.03.1995 | GR | 22.03.1995 | NL | 22.03.1995 | LU | 31.10.1995 | [2003/11] |
Former [2000/27] | AT | 22.03.1995 | |
BE | 22.03.1995 | ||
GR | 22.03.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
NL | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 22.03.1995 | |
BE | 22.03.1995 | ||
GR | 22.03.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 22.03.1995 | |
BE | 22.03.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 22.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | US4167711 [ ] (SMOOT GEORGE W); | US4546330 [ ] (OKADA TOSHIRO [JP]); | US4562411 [ ] (O'ROURKE DAVID P [US], et al) |