EP0390767 - Airtight manhole closure device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Debergh, Ludo Maastrichtersteenweg 80 B-3770 Riemst / BE | [1990/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Vigneron, Jean, et al NOVAMARK & VIGNERON Boulevard du Souverain 7 1170 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | Vigneron, Jean, et al Cabinet VIGNERON 30 avenue Eugène Godaux B-1150 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 90870047.9 | 30.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | BE19890000363 | 31.03.1989 Original published format: BE 8900363 | BE19890000750 | 10.07.1989 Original published format: BE 8900750 | [1990/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0390767 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0390767 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390767 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/14 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
E02D29/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1990/40] | Title | German: | Luftdichter Strassenkappenverschluss | [1990/40] | English: | Airtight manhole closure device | [1990/40] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture étanche pour regard | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 07.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.04.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.03.1993 | DE | 10.03.1993 | ES | 10.03.1993 | GB | 10.03.1993 | IT | 10.03.1993 | NL | 10.03.1993 | CH | 31.03.1993 | FR | 31.03.1993 | LI | 31.03.1993 | LU | 31.03.1993 | [2008/36] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 10.03.1993 | |
DE | 10.03.1993 | ||
ES | 10.03.1993 | ||
GB | 10.03.1993 | ||
IT | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
LU | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 10.03.1993 | |
DE | 10.03.1993 | ||
GB | 10.03.1993 | ||
IT | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
LU | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 10.03.1993 | |
DE | 10.03.1993 | ||
GB | 10.03.1993 | ||
IT | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 10.03.1993 | |
DE | 10.03.1993 | ||
GB | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1994/04] | DE | 10.03.1993 | |
GB | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1994/03] | DE | 10.03.1993 | |
GB | 10.03.1993 | ||
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | GB | 10.03.1993 | |
NL | 10.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/45] | NL | 10.03.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE119697 ; | [A]US1936026 ; | [Y]DE111558 ; | [A]US2927599 (JOHN STETSON); | [A]GB203230 ; | [A]GB485192 ; | [A]GB414155 ; | [A]US1475199 ; | [A]FR2456169 ; | [A]GB2156882 ; | [A]DE221835 |