EP0440009 - Device and method for the modulated cooling of a moving cylindrical object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE DE RECHERCHES METALLURGIQUES a.s.b.l., CENTRUM VOOR RESEARCH IN DE METALLURGIE v.z.w. Rue Montoyer, 47 B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states CENTRE DE RECHERCHES METALLURGIQUES CENTRUM VOOR RESEARCH IN DE METALLURGIE Association sans but lucratif Vereniging zonder winstoogmerk Rue Montoyer, 47 B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noville, Jean-François Rue Clerbeau, 6 B-4041 Milmort / BE | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Lacasse, Lucien, et al CENTRE DE RECHERCHES METALLURGIQUES Abbaye du Val-Benoît 11, rue Ernest Solvay 4000 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Lacasse, Lucien Emile, et al CENTRE DE RECHERCHES METALLURGIQUES Abbaye du Val-Benoît 11, rue Ernest Solvay B-4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 90870241.8 | 18.12.1990 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | BE19900000122 | 01.02.1990 Original published format: BE 9000122 | [1991/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0440009 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0440009 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440009 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B21B45/02 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
C21D11/005 (EP);
B21B37/74 (EP);
B21B45/0224 (EP);
B21B17/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur modulierten Kühlung eines sich bewegenden zylindrischen Gegenstandes | [1991/32] | English: | Device and method for the modulated cooling of a moving cylindrical object | [1991/32] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour le refroidissement modulé d'un élément cylindrique en défilement | [1991/32] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 14.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.1993 | DE | 29.09.1993 | ES | 29.09.1993 | GB | 29.09.1993 | IT | 29.09.1993 | NL | 29.09.1993 | SE | 29.09.1993 | BE | 31.12.1993 | LU | 31.12.1993 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 29.09.1993 | |
DE | 29.09.1993 | ||
GB | 29.09.1993 | ||
IT | 29.09.1993 | ||
NL | 29.09.1993 | ||
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
BE | 31.12.1993 | ||
LU | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 29.09.1993 | |
DE | 29.09.1993 | ||
GB | 29.09.1993 | ||
IT | 29.09.1993 | ||
NL | 29.09.1993 | ||
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
BE | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1995/11] | AT | 29.09.1993 | |
DE | 29.09.1993 | ||
GB | 29.09.1993 | ||
NL | 29.09.1993 | ||
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
BE | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/41] | AT | 29.09.1993 | |
DE | 29.09.1993 | ||
GB | 29.09.1993 | ||
NL | 29.09.1993 | ||
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | AT | 29.09.1993 | |
DE | 29.09.1993 | ||
NL | 29.09.1993 | ||
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 29.09.1993 | |
DE | 29.09.1993 | ||
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 29.09.1993 | |
SE | 29.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | SE | 29.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2021998 (ARBED); | [A]DE3424550 (KRUPP GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0233854 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE [BE]); | [AP]EP0366639 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE [BE]) |