EP0388397 - Device for laying down a web-like material on a work table [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blaimschein, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing. Arnhalmweg 33 A-4407 Steyr / AT | [1990/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Heiner, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher, Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher, Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 90890051.7 | 01.03.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | AT19890000580 | 14.03.1989 Original published format: AT 58089 | [1990/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0388397 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0388397 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0388397 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65H35/04, B65H45/101, B65H45/103 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
B65H45/103 (EP,US);
B65H35/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Auflegen von Bandmaterial auf einen Arbeitstisch | [1990/38] | English: | Device for laying down a web-like material on a work table | [1990/38] | French: | Dispositif pour déposer une bande sur une table de travail | [1990/38] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 12.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Request for further processing for: | 03.12.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 29.11.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.12.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 19.10.1994 | IT | 19.10.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 19.10.1994 | |
IT | 19.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/37] | GB | 19.10.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3332681 (GILBERT ABNER I); | [A]FR1131990 ; | [A]EP0088314 (OCE NEDERLAND BV [NL]) |