EP0408544 - Relay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EH-SCHRACK COMPONENTS Aktiengesellschaft Seybelgasse 13 A-1235 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states EH-SCHRACK COMPONENTS-Aktiengesellschaft Seybelgasse 13 A-1235 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casari, Peter Mühlgasse 3/43 A-2351 Wr. Neudorf / AT | [1991/03] | Representative(s) | Gibler, Ferdinand Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte OG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Gibler, Ferdinand, Dipl.Ing. Dr. techn. Dorotheergasse 7/14 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 90890209.1 | 10.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | AT19890001691 | 12.07.1989 Original published format: AT 169189 | [1991/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0408544 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0408544 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0408544 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/28, H01H50/32 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
H01H50/326 (EP);
H01H9/286 (EP);
H01H2300/066 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/03] | H01H50/32, H01H9/28 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/03] | Title | German: | Relais | [1991/03] | English: | Relay | [1991/03] | French: | Relais | [1991/03] | Examination procedure | 12.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 21.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 18.10.1995 | SE | 18.01.1996 | [1998/15] |
Former [1996/23] | SE | 18.01.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4502030 ; | [Y]US4378543 ; | [A]FR2466848 ; | [A]DE8812573U |