EP0449858 - HIGH-VOLTAGE TRANSISTOR ARRANGEMENT PRODUCED BY CMOS TECHNOLOGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | Opposition rejected | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 D-80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIMMER, Günter Am Steinwerth 10 D-4100 Duisburg 29 / DE | 02 /
ROTH, Walter Am Oespeler Dorney 2 D-4600 Dortmund 72 / DE | 03 /
SELIGER, Siegfried Am Lohbach 114 D-4600 Dortmund 30 / DE | 04 /
DE WINTER, Rudi Corbiestraat 9 B-3550 Heusden-Zolder / BE | [1991/41] | Application number, filing date | 90900056.4 | 06.12.1989 | [1991/41] | WO1989DE00756 | Priority number, date | DE19883843644 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: DE 3843644 | [1991/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9007794 | Date: | 12.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0449858 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449858 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/092 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
H01L27/0922 (EP);
H01L29/1045 (EP);
H01L29/7835 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/41] | Title | German: | HOCHSPANNUNGSTRANSISTOR-ANORDNUNG IN CMOS-TECHNOLOGIE | [1991/41] | English: | HIGH-VOLTAGE TRANSISTOR ARRANGEMENT PRODUCED BY CMOS TECHNOLOGY | [1991/41] | French: | TRANSISTOR HAUTE TENSION OBTENU PAR TECHNIQUE CMOS | [1991/41] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 29.05.1992 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 07.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.09.1992 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 01.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.06.1993
02.11.1994
ADMISSIBLE X-FAB Gesellschaft zur Fertigung von Wafern mbH Haarbergstr. 61 D-99097 Erfurt / DE | [1993/36] | 22.07.1994 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 28.09.1994 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 07.11.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.03.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.03.1995 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 22.05.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1996 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 30.09.1996 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.05.1993 | NL | 05.05.1993 | AT | 06.12.1993 | CH | 31.12.1993 | LI | 31.12.1993 | [1995/29] |
Former [1994/48] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
CH | 31.12.1993 | ||
LI | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | BE | 05.05.1993 | |
NL | 05.05.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | NL | 05.05.1993 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0160183 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]); | [X]EP0179693 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [Y]EP0148342 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]DE3121224 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [A]GB2028581 (STANDARD MICROSYST SMC) |