EP0445197 - TROUGH FOR PLANT-POTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISCHER, Ralf Rüdiger Einhardtstrasse D-63110 Rodgau / DE | For all designated states FISCHER, Bernd Einhardtstrasse D-63110 Rodgau / DE | [1991/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Katscher, Helmut Katscher Habermann Patentanwälte Dolivostrasse 15A 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Katscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Fröbelweg 1 D-64291 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 90900126.5 | 21.11.1989 | [1991/37] | WO1989EP01411 | Priority number, date | DE19883839664 | 24.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3839664 | [1991/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9005447 | Date: | 31.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445197 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445197 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/10 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
A01G9/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/37] | Title | German: | TROG FÜR PFLANZENTÖPFE | [1991/37] | English: | TROUGH FOR PLANT-POTS | [1991/37] | French: | BAC POUR POTS DE FLEURS | [1991/37] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.1991 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 16.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.10.1993 | ES | 06.10.1993 | FR | 06.10.1993 | GB | 06.10.1993 | IT | 06.10.1993 | CH | 30.11.1993 | LI | 30.11.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
ES | 06.10.1993 | ||
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
IT | 06.10.1993 | ||
CH | 30.11.1993 | ||
LI | 30.11.1993 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
IT | 06.10.1993 | ||
CH | 30.11.1993 | ||
LI | 30.11.1993 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
CH | 30.11.1993 | ||
LI | 30.11.1993 | ||
FR | 25.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
CH | 30.11.1993 | ||
LI | 30.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/41] | BE | 06.10.1993 | |
GB | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/38] | BE | 06.10.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2124192 (FERRAND MARCEL [FR]); | [A]FR1346075 ; | [A]US4476651 (DRURY GEOFFREY [US]); | [A]FR2442005 (DOFTORAS SARAH) | Examination | DE2732982 |