EP0404962 - ANOMALY DETECTING METHOD IN A SERVO SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUBARA, S. Room 8-203 Fanuc Manshonharimomi 3511-1, Shibokusa Oshino-mura, Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [1991/01] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake & Co Hazlitt House 28, Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90900347.7 | 25.12.1989 | [1991/01] | WO1989JP01298 | Priority number, date | JP19890011373 | 10.01.1989 Original published format: JP 1137389 | [1991/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9008353 | Date: | 26.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0404962 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.07.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/405 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
G05B19/4062 (EP,US);
G05B2219/33286 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42194 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42268 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42307 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/01] | G05D3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/01] | Title | German: | NACHWEIS VON ANOMALIEN IN EINEM SERVOLENKSYSTEM | [1991/01] | English: | ANOMALY DETECTING METHOD IN A SERVO SYSTEM | [1991/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETECTION D'ANOMALIES DANS UN SERVOSYSTEME | [1991/01] | File destroyed: | 24.08.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.1990 | Translation filed | 12.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1990 | Search fee paid | 12.09.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/01] | 10.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS58219614 ; | [X]US4159444 (BARTLETT LARRY A [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]FR2528191 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]DE3416496 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) [Y] 3 * page 13, line 26 - line 28 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840407), vol. 8, no. 75, Database accession no. (P - 266), & JP58219614 A 00000000 (FUJITSU FANUC) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 3 | International search | [X]JPH06235918 (OHTSU TIRE & RUBBER CO LTD, et al); | [X]JPS62290901 (AMADA CO LTD) |