EP0447470 - HIGH-STRENGTH MULTI-PHASE SILICON NITRIDE CERAMIC MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.1995 [1995/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEUCKERT, Marcellus Platanenweg 8 D-6233 Kelkheim / DE | [1991/39] | Application number, filing date | 90900811.2 | 18.11.1989 | [1991/39] | WO1989EP01397 | Priority number, date | DE19883840171 | 29.11.1988 Original published format: DE 3840171 | [1991/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9006293 | Date: | 14.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0447470 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447470 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/58 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
C04B35/584 (EP);
C04B35/58 (KR);
F16C2206/60 (EP);
F16C2360/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1991/39] | Title | German: | MEHRPHASIGE SILICIUMNITRIDKERAMIK MIT HOHER FESTIGKEIT UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1991/39] | English: | HIGH-STRENGTH MULTI-PHASE SILICON NITRIDE CERAMIC MATERIAL AND PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF THE SAME | [1991/39] | French: | CERAMIQUE DE NITRURE DE SILICIUM POLYPHASIQUE A HAUTE RESISTANCE ET PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION | [1991/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/39] | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.01.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0080050 [ ] (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | EP0228276 [ ] (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | DE3617488 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]) |