EP0448618 - IMPROVEMENTS TO RDS RADIO SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH BROADCASTING CORPORATION Broadcasting House London W1A 1AA / GB | [1991/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARNALL, Simon, John 54 Beckway Road London SW16 4HA / GB | 02 /
NEWLAND, Jonathan David 66 Edridge Road Croydon, Surrey CRO 1ES / GB | 03 /
KAMALSKI, Theo Weigeliastraat 20 NL-6026 BK Maarheeze / NL | 04 /
BERGMAN, Sten Artillerigaten 63 S-114 45 Stockholm / SE | 05 /
BERGER, Josef Steinbruchgasse 6 A-2500 Baden / AT | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Abnett, Richard Charles, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Abnett, Richard Charles, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90900945.8 | 15.12.1989 | [1991/40] | WO1989GB01544 | Priority number, date | GB19880029274 | 15.12.1988 Original published format: GB 8829274 | [1991/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9007237 | Date: | 28.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0448618 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0448618 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0448618 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
H04H60/41 (EP,US);
H04H2201/13 (EP,US);
H04H2201/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/40] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTES RDS-FUNKSYSTEM | [1994/38] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS TO RDS RADIO SYSTEM | [1991/40] | French: | SYSTEME RADIO RDS PERFECTIONNE | [1991/40] |
Former [1991/40] | RDS-FUNKSYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.1991 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/40] | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.1995
04.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.1995
04.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
Former [1995/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.1995
04.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 D-40210 Düsseldorf / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 03.08.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.03.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 30.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.03.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.05.1999 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 15.01.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.05.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.11.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 16.07.1999 | Appeal received No. T0744/99 | 19.09.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.01.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 15.01.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.01.2002 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE8717290U [ ] | [ ] - Specifications of the European Broadcasting Union, Ref. EBU 3244-E, March 1984 (Brussels, BE) "Specification of the Radio Data System RDS for VHF/FM Sound Broadcasting", pages 1-60 | [ ] - Elektronik, Vol. 37, No. 7, 31 March 1988, (Munich, DE) F. STOLLENWERK: "Datenubertragung in UKW-Rundfunk", pages 77,78,80,82,82, |