EP0451183 - CAPACITIVE HUMIDITY SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLUCON B.V. Kalkovenweg 54, P.O. Box 2065 NL-2400 CB Alphen aan den Rijn / NL | [1991/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMITZ, Pieter, Paulus, Jozef Engelenburg 11 NL-2402 KM Alphen aan den Rijn / NL | [1991/42] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/42] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 90901043.1 | 28.12.1989 | [1991/42] | WO1989NL00100 | Priority number, date | NL19880003223 | 30.12.1988 Original published format: NL 8803223 | [1991/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9007708 | Date: | 12.07.1990 | [1990/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0451183 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0451183 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/22 | [1991/42] | CPC: |
G01N27/225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/42] | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVER FEUCHTIGKEITSFÜHLER | [1991/42] | English: | CAPACITIVE HUMIDITY SENSOR | [1991/42] | French: | CAPTEUR D'HUMIDITE CAPACITIF | [1991/42] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.1991 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2327536 [ ] (LINDE AG [DE]); | DE3203990 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | EP0094266 [ ] (DIRECTION DE LA METEOROL DU MI [FR]); | FR2554593 [ ] (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE [FR]); | GB2159956 [ ] (SHARP KK) |