EP0444158 - CONJUGATED POLYPEPTIDES AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 300 Lakeside Drive 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA 300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULTZ, Peter 6331 Valley View Oakland, CA 94611 / US | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 90901365.8 | 15.11.1989 | [1991/36] | WO1989US05257 | Priority number, date | US19880273786 | 18.11.1988 Original published format: US 273786 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9005749 | Date: | 31.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444158 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444158 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07K17/06, C12N9/96 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
A61K49/0043 (EP);
C07K14/655 (KR);
A61K47/68 (EP);
A61K49/0013 (EP);
A61K49/0039 (EP);
A61K49/0056 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/44] |
Former [1991/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | KONJUGIERTE POLYPEPTIDE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [1991/36] | English: | CONJUGATED POLYPEPTIDES AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND USE | [1991/36] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES CONJUGUES, LEURS PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ET D'UTILISATION | [1991/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1991 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1991 | Search fee paid | 07.06.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 20.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9005746 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [E]WO9005785 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) | [XP] - SCIENCE, vol. 242, 11th November 1988, pages 1038-1040; S.J. POLLACK et al.: "Introduction of nucleophiles and spectroscopic probes into antibody combining sites" | [XP] - STN FILE SERVER, File CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 112, no. 15, 1989, abstract no. 135115t, Columbus, Ohio, US; S.J. POLLACK et al.: "Design of catalytic antibodies" & METHODS ENZYMOL., 1978(ANTIBODIES, ANTIGENS, MOL. MIMICRY), 551-68 | [XP] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, vol. 83, September 1986, pages 6736-6740; A. TRAMONTANO et al.: "Chemical reactivity at an antibody binding site elicited by mechanistic design of a synthetic antigen" | [XP] - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 111, no. 6, March 1989, pages 1929-1931, American Chemical Society; S.C. POLLACK et al.: "A semisynthetic catalytic antibody" | International search | [Y]US4059685 (JOHNSON LAVELL R); | [X]EP0187658 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]); | [X]US4722906 (GUIRE PATRICK E [US]) | [Y] - D.R. COREY, "Generation of a Hybrid Sequence-Specific Single-Stranded Deoxyribonuclease", Science Volume 238, published 4 December 1987, see pages 1401-1402. | [Y] - R.M. BAUM, "Catalytic Autibodies Open up New Strategy for Protein Engineering", C & EN, published 6 April 1987, see pages 31 and 33. | [XP] - I. AMATO, "Teaching Antibodies New Tricks", Science News Volume 136, published 2 September 1989. See pages 153 and 155. | [Y] - E.T. KAISER, "Chemical mutation of enzyme active enzyme active site", Science Volume 226, published 2 November 1984. See pages 505, 506 and 509-511. | [XP] - S.J. POLLACK, "Introduction of nucleophiles and spectroscopic probes into antibody combining sites", Sciece Volume 242, published 18 November 1988. See pages 1038-1040. | [XP] - S.J. POLLACK, "A semisynthetic catalytic antibody", J. Am. Chem. Soc. Volume 111, published 1989. See pages 1929 and 1930. | [YP] - B.S. GREEN, "Catalytic monoclonal antibodies tailor-made, enzyme-like catalysts for chemical reactions", TIBTECH Volume 7, published November 1989. See p. 308. | [Y] - D. GIVOL, "Affinity labeling and cross-linking of the haevy and light chains of a myeloma protein with anti-2,4-dinitrophenyl activity", Biochemistry Volume 10, Number 18, published 1971. See pages 346, 3464 and 3466. | Examination | - C & EN, published 6 April 1987, see pages 31 and 33. | - 10, Number 18, published 1971. See pages 346, 3464 and 3466. |