EP0465648 - LAMINATED RESIN FILM HAVING METALLIC APPEARANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | For all designated states NIPPON CARBIDE KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OCHI, Katsura 571-1, Aoshima Uozu-shi, Toyama 937 / JP | 02 /
OONISHI, Yasuaki 571-1, Aoshima Uozu-shi, Toyama 739 / JP | 03 /
KINSEN, Kazuhisa 571-1, Aoshima Uozu-shi, Toyama 937 / JP | [1992/03] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/03] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90901665.1 | 08.01.1990 | [1992/03] | WO1990JP00009 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9110562 | Date: | 25.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465648 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465648 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.07.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/30, B05D5/06, B32B15/08, B44C3/02 | [1995/31] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (EP);
B32B27/304 (US);
B32B27/40 (US);
B44C1/14 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (US);
B32B2255/205 (US);
B32B2307/54 (US);
B32B2327/06 (US);
B32B2375/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/03] | B32B15/08, B44C3/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/03] | Title | German: | LAMINIERTER HARZFILM MIT METALLAUSSEHEN | [1992/03] | English: | LAMINATED RESIN FILM HAVING METALLIC APPEARANCE | [1992/03] | French: | FILM STRATIFIE A BASE DE RESINE A L'ASPECT METALLIQUE | [1992/03] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.1991 | Translation filed | 06.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.1991 | Search fee paid | 06.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/03] | 25.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 05.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60092832 ; | [X]JP55158962 ; | [A]US4317857 | [X] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Week 2785, 24 May 1985 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 85-162462 & JP-A-60 092 832 (TOPPAN PRINTING KK) 24 May 1985, & JP60092832 A 19850524 | [X] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Week 0781, 11 December 1980 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 81-10863D & JP-A-55 158 962 (OIKE IND LTD) 11 December 1980, & JP55158962 A 19801211 | International search | [Y]JPS63110048 ; | [A]JPS6255434U ; | [A]JPS59157276 |