EP0417217 - PEPTIDES WITH SULPHATE ESTER GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1991 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 11.09.1991 [1991/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FISONS CORPORATION Jefferson Road P.O. Box 1710 Rochester, New York 14603 / US | [1991/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSAMUND, James D. 187 Burlington Avenue Rochester, NY 14619 / US | [1991/12] | Representative(s) | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae FISONS plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | Wright, Robert Gordon McRae FISONS plc 12 Derby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 0BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 90901848.3 | 18.01.1990 | [1991/12] | WO1990GB00080 | Priority number, date | US19890303425 | 26.01.1989 Original published format: US 303425 | [1991/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9008773 | Date: | 09.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0417217 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, C07K7/30, A61K37/02 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
A61P3/04 (EP);
C07K14/595 (EP,US);
C07K14/5955 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/12] | Title | German: | PEPTIDE MIT SULFATESTER-GRUPPEN | [1991/12] | English: | PEPTIDES WITH SULPHATE ESTER GROUPS | [1991/12] | French: | PEPTIDES A GROUPES D'ESTER DE SULFATE | [1991/12] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/37: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 90300547.8/0381340 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 26.07.91 | EPB 1991/37: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 90300547.8/0381340 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 26.07.91 | EPB 1991/37: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 90300547.8/0381340 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 26.07.91 | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.1990 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0268297 [ ] (PENNWALT CORP [US]); | EP0226217 [ ] (PENNWALT CORP [US]) | [ ] - Peptides Chemistry and Biology, Proceedings of the Tenth American Peptide Symposium, 23-28 May 1987, St. Louis, Missouri, US, Edited by Garland R. Marshall, 1988, Escom, (Leiden, NL), J.D. ROSAMOND et al.: "Structural Requirements for the Satiety Effect of CCK-8"pages 610-612 | [ ] - Int. J. Peptide Protein Res., Vol. 31, No. 6, 1988, E.E. SUGG et al.: "Cholecystokinic Activity of NX-Hydroxysulfonyl- (Nle28,31) CCK26-33 Analogues Modified at the C-Terminal Residue"pages 514-519 | [ ] - Peptides Chemistry and Biology, Proceedings of the Tenth American Peptide Symposium, 23-28 May 1987, St. Louis, Missouri, US, Edited by Garland R. Marshall, 1988, Escom, (Leiden, NL), T.K. SAWYER et al.: "Structure-activity Relationships of Pancreatic, Analogs: Comparison of Pancreatic, Pyloric Sphincter and Brainstem CCK Receptor Activities with in Vivo Anorexigenic Effects"pages 503-504 |