EP0408709 - CEILING/LUGGAGE-RACK COMBINATION FOR THE PASSENGER CABIN OF AN AIRCRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Aerospace Airbus GmbH Kreetslag 10 D-21129 Hamburg / DE | [1993/12] |
Former [1993/06] | For all designated states Deutsche Airbus GmbH Kreetslag 10 D-21129 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/04] | For all designated states Deutsche Airbus GmbH Arabellastrasse. 30 D-8000 München 81 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANTHEY, Heinz Am Pavillon 19 D-2100 Hamburg 90 / DE | 02 /
GLIMMANN, Hans Eichholz 30 D-2152 Horneburg / DE | 03 /
TYBURSKI, Gustav Mittelsdorfer Weg 14 D-2160 Stade / DE | 04 /
SCHULTZ, Holger Lentersweg 39 D-2000 Hamburg 63 / DE | 05 /
PROBST, Arne Lipstek 10 A D-2103 Hamburg 95 / DE | 06 /
POPPINGA, Georg Siebentunnelweg 5 A D-2083 Halstenbeck / DE | 07 /
NOCON, Günther Dammhauserstra e 92 D-2150 Buxtehude / DE | 08 /
BOCK, Thomas-Mathias Estebogen 21 D-2101 Hamburg 96 / DE | 09 /
SCHWERTFEGER, Günter Kählerstra e 46 D-2150 Buxtehude / DE | [1991/04] | Application number, filing date | 90902153.7 | 03.02.1990 | [1991/04] | WO1990DE00074 | Priority number, date | DE19893903491 | 06.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3903491 | DE19893904375 | 14.02.1989 Original published format: DE 3904375 | [1991/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9008674 | Date: | 09.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0408709 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0408709 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q3/02, B64D11/00 | [1991/04] | CPC: |
B60Q3/43 (EP,US);
B64D11/003 (EP,US);
B64D2011/0038 (EP,US);
Y02T50/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/04] | Title | German: | DECKEN-GEPÄCKABLAGEN-KOMBINATION FÜR DIE PASSAGIERKABINE EINES FLUGZEUGES | [1991/04] | English: | CEILING/LUGGAGE-RACK COMBINATION FOR THE PASSENGER CABIN OF AN AIRCRAFT | [1991/04] | French: | PLAFOND ET COMPARTIMENT A BAGAGES COMBINES POUR LES CABINES D'AVION | [1991/04] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 29.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/22] | Request for further processing for: | 27.11.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 27.11.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.01.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2595858 (KUHLER OTTO A); | [A]US2582738 (ARENBERG ALBERT L); | [A]US3535505 (FENNER ERNEST A) |