EP0473583 - Gear transmission between an input shaft and two contra-rotating concentric output shafts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/11] | DEVICE FOR CONTRA-ROTATING TWO CONCENTRIC SHAFTS | ||
[1995/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROWN GEAR B.V. Buurserstraat 200 7544 RG Enschede / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states CROWN GEAR B.V. Buurserstraat 200 NL-7544 RG Enschede / NL | ||
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states CROWN GEAR B.V. Corelli 4 NL-2394 GZ Hazerswoude-Rijndijk / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUYPERS, Martinus, Hubertus Penelopestraat 219 NL-5631 CM Eindhoven / NL | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas, et al Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas, Ir., et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 90902395.4 | 09.01.1990 | [1992/11] | WO1990NL00002 | Priority number, date | NL19890000062 | 11.01.1989 Original published format: NL 8900062 | [1992/11] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9008271 | Date: | 26.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473583 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0473583 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/22, B63H5/10 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
F16H1/222 (EP,US);
B63H5/10 (EP,US);
F16H48/06 (EP,US);
F16H2048/102 (EP,US);
F16H48/40 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19074 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/11] | Title | German: | Zahnradgetriebe zwischen einer Eingangswelle und zwei gegenlaufenden konzentrischen Ausgangswellen | [1995/15] | English: | Gear transmission between an input shaft and two contra-rotating concentric output shafts | [1995/15] | French: | Transmission à engrenage entre un arbre d'entrée et deux arbres concentriques de sortie contra-rotatifs | [1995/15] |
Former [1992/11] | GEGENLAUFANTRIEB FÜR ZWEI KONZENTRISCHE WELLEN | ||
Former [1992/11] | DEVICE FOR CONTRA-ROTATING TWO CONCENTRIC SHAFTS | ||
Former [1992/11] | DISPOSITIF DE CONTRE-ROTATION DE DEUX ARBRES CONCENTRIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.1990 | Translation filed | 20.06.1991 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.06.1991 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 11.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.04.1995 | BE | 12.04.1995 | CH | 12.04.1995 | DK | 12.04.1995 | ES | 12.04.1995 | IT | 12.04.1995 | LI | 12.04.1995 | NL | 12.04.1995 | SE | 12.07.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 12.04.1995 | |
BE | 12.04.1995 | ||
CH | 12.04.1995 | ||
DK | 12.04.1995 | ||
ES | 12.04.1995 | ||
IT | 12.04.1995 | ||
LI | 12.04.1995 | ||
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 12.04.1995 | |
BE | 12.04.1995 | ||
CH | 12.04.1995 | ||
DK | 12.04.1995 | ||
IT | 12.04.1995 | ||
LI | 12.04.1995 | ||
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 12.04.1995 | |
BE | 12.04.1995 | ||
CH | 12.04.1995 | ||
DK | 12.04.1995 | ||
LI | 12.04.1995 | ||
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 12.04.1995 | |
BE | 12.04.1995 | ||
CH | 12.04.1995 | ||
LI | 12.04.1995 | ||
SE | 12.07.1995 | ||
Former [1996/02] | AT | 12.04.1995 | |
CH | 12.04.1995 | ||
LI | 12.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/44] | CH | 12.04.1995 | |
LI | 12.04.1995 | Cited in | International search | GB538731 [ ] (JOSEPH BROWN); | US2987031 [ ] (ODDEN CONRAD R); | FR1473407 [ ] (WAGNER JOSEF); | DE8803194U [ ]; | US4792314 [ ] (MCCORMICK DANIEL F [US]) |