EP0455697 - MACHINE FOR PROCESSING GOODS, ESPECIALLY REFUSE, FOR SORTING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WROBLEWSKI, Franz Bruno Granitvägen 8 S-826 00 Söderhamn / SE | [1991/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Wiklund, Erik, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Wiklund, Erik, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 90902416.8 | 09.01.1990 | [1991/46] | WO1990SE00013 | Priority number, date | SE19890000240 | 24.01.1989 Original published format: SE 8900240 | [1991/46] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9008597 | Date: | 09.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0455697 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0455697 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B02C18/40, B02C23/08, B07B13/04 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
B07B9/00 (EP);
B03B9/06 (EP);
B03C7/06 (EP);
B07B1/24 (EP);
Y02W30/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/46] | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON GÜTERN, INSBESONDERE VON ABFÄLLEN ZWECKS DEREN SICHTUNG | [1991/46] | English: | MACHINE FOR PROCESSING GOODS, ESPECIALLY REFUSE, FOR SORTING IT | [1991/46] | French: | MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT DE MARCHANDISES, EN PARTICULIER DE DECHETS, EN VUE DE LEUR TRIAGE | [1991/46] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.1990 | Translation filed | 11.07.1991 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 25.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 07.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Request for further processing for: | 24.08.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 24.08.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.09.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 23.03.1994 | ES | 23.03.1994 | FR | 23.03.1994 | IT | 23.03.1994 | LI | 23.03.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | CH | 23.03.1994 | |
ES | 23.03.1994 | ||
IT | 23.03.1994 | ||
LI | 23.03.1994 | ||
FR | 12.08.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 23.03.1994 | |
IT | 23.03.1994 | ||
LI | 23.03.1994 | ||
FR | 12.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/07] | CH | 23.03.1994 | |
LI | 23.03.1994 | ||
FR | 12.08.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | CH | 23.03.1994 | |
LI | 23.03.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4693287 (WROBLEWSKI FRANZ [SE]) |