EP0462978 - A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE BIOLOGICAL CONTROL OF INSECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.1999 [1999/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EcoScience Corporation 85 North Whitney Street Amherst Massachusetts 01002 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states EcoScience Corporation 85 North Whitney Street Amherst, Massachusetts 01002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUNNER, Haim, B. 8 Morgan Place Amherst, MA 01002 / US | 02 /
AGUDELO-SILVA, Fernando 839 Lake Street San Francisco, California 94118 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Carol, Ann 24A North Farms Road Haydenville, MA 01039 / US | 04 /
Broza, Meir 20 Yanai Street Haifa / IL | [1992/05] |
Former [1992/04] | 01 /
GUNNER, Haim, B. 8 Morgan Place Amherst, MA 01002 / US | ||
02 /
AGUDELO-SILVA, Fernando 839 Lake Street San Francisco, California 94118 / US | |||
03 /
JOHNSON, Carol, Ann 24A North Farms Road Haydenville, MA 01039 / US | |||
Former [1992/01] | 01 /
GUNNER, Haim, B. 8 Morgan Place Amherst, MA 01002 / US | ||
02 /
AGUDELO-SILVA, Fernando 89 North East Street Amherst, MA 01002 / US | |||
03 /
JOHNSON, Carol, Ann 24A North Farms Road Haydenville, MA 01039 / US | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | Bassett, Richard Simon ERIC POTTER & CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90902478.8 | 11.01.1990 | [1992/01] | WO1990US00274 | Priority number, date | US19890324461 | 15.03.1989 Original published format: US 324461 | [1992/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9010389 | Date: | 20.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0462978 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/04 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
A01M1/2011 (EP,KR,US);
A01M1/2016 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/006 (KR);
A01N25/34 (KR);
A01N63/30 (EP,US);
A01M2200/011 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N63/30, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N63/30, A01N61/00, A01N25/34, A01N25/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/01] | Title | German: | METHODE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BIOLOGISCHEN KONTROLLE VON INSEKTEN | [1992/01] | English: | A METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE BIOLOGICAL CONTROL OF INSECTS | [1992/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF INSECTICIDES BIOLOGIQUES | [1992/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.1991 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1990 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.08.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 20.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 02.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/11] | 16.09.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/11] | Request for further processing for: | 02.06.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 06.05.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.06.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]AU561555B (UNIV ADELAIDE) | [X] - Dialog Information Services, File 351, World Patent Index 81-89, Dialog accession no. 4288448, LUMINUS PTY LTD; "Controlling soil inhibiting pests esp. scar abeid beetle larvae by applying select strain of fungus of the species metarhizium anisopliae and/or Beauveria bassimia to the soil", AU 8654766, A, 860918, 8645 (Basic), see the whole abstract. | [X] - J. Insect. Physiol., Vol. 35, No. 2, 1989 I.M. Huxham et al.: "Inhibitory effects of cyclodepsipeptides, destruxins, from the fungus metarhizium anisopliae, on cellular immunity in insects ", see page 97- page 105 and the whole article. | [X] - Derwent's abstract No. 122 600 C/07, SU 6 640 995, publ. week 8007 | [X] - Derwent's abstract No. 874 800 E/41, SU 8 880 898, publ. week 8241 | [X] - Derwent's abstract, No. 83-793 910/42, SU 9 820 630, publ. week 8342 | [X] - Journal of Invertebrate Pathology, Vol. 53, 1989 I.M. Huxham et al.: "In vivo and in vitro assays for pathogenicity of wild-type and mutant strains of metarhizium anisopliae for three insectspecies ", see page 143- page 151. | by applicant | US3337395 | GB2095965 | AU561555B | GB2196645 | - HUXHAM ET AL., J. INVERT PATHOL., (1989), vol. 53, pages 143 - 151 |