EP0414842 - IMPROVED DIAMOND DEPOSITION CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELESTECH, INC. 17751-F Sky Park East Irvine, CA 92714 / US | [1991/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANN, Gordon L. 1316 Skyline Drive Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | [1994/31] |
Former [1991/10] | 01 /
CANN, Gordon, L. 1316 Skyline Drive Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | ||
Former [1991/10] | Lucas, Brian Ronald Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90902516.5 | 08.01.1990 | [1991/10] | WO1990US00192 | Priority number, date | US19890293968 | 06.01.1989 Original published format: US 293968 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9007586 | Date: | 12.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0414842 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0414842 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/26, C23C16/44, C30B25/02, C30B29/04 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
C23C16/44 (EP);
C23C16/27 (EP);
C30B25/02 (EP);
C30B29/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/10] | Title | German: | KAMMER ZUR ABLAGERUNG VON DIAMANT | [1991/10] | English: | IMPROVED DIAMOND DEPOSITION CELL | [1991/10] | French: | CELLULE AMELIOREE POUR DEPOT DE DIAMANT | [1991/10] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.1990 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 08.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.1994 | BE | 03.08.1994 | CH | 03.08.1994 | DK | 03.08.1994 | ES | 03.08.1994 | IT | 03.08.1994 | LI | 03.08.1994 | NL | 03.08.1994 | DE | 04.11.1994 | LU | 31.01.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 03.08.1994 | |
BE | 03.08.1994 | ||
CH | 03.08.1994 | ||
DK | 03.08.1994 | ||
ES | 03.08.1994 | ||
IT | 03.08.1994 | ||
LI | 03.08.1994 | ||
NL | 03.08.1994 | ||
DE | 04.11.1994 | ||
LU | 31.01.1995 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 03.08.1994 | |
BE | 03.08.1994 | ||
CH | 03.08.1994 | ||
DK | 03.08.1994 | ||
IT | 03.08.1994 | ||
LI | 03.08.1994 | ||
NL | 03.08.1994 | ||
DE | 04.11.1994 | ||
LU | 31.01.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 03.08.1994 | |
BE | 03.08.1994 | ||
CH | 03.08.1994 | ||
DK | 03.08.1994 | ||
IT | 03.08.1994 | ||
LI | 03.08.1994 | ||
NL | 03.08.1994 | ||
DE | 04.11.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 03.08.1994 | |
BE | 03.08.1994 | ||
CH | 03.08.1994 | ||
DK | 03.08.1994 | ||
LI | 03.08.1994 | ||
NL | 03.08.1994 | ||
DE | 04.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/26] | AT | 03.08.1994 | |
BE | 03.08.1994 | ||
CH | 03.08.1994 | ||
LI | 03.08.1994 | ||
NL | 03.08.1994 | ||
DE | 04.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 03.08.1994 | |
CH | 03.08.1994 | ||
LI | 03.08.1994 | ||
NL | 03.08.1994 | ||
DE | 04.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 03.08.1994 | |
CH | 03.08.1994 | ||
LI | 03.08.1994 | ||
DE | 04.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 03.08.1994 | |
CH | 03.08.1994 | ||
LI | 03.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | CH | 03.08.1994 | |
LI | 03.08.1994 | Cited in | International search | US4152182 [ ] (RUTZ RICHARD F [US]); | US4647512 [ ] (VENKATARAMANAN N [US], et al) |