EP0439614 - GAS MIXTURE FOR THERMO-CHEMICAL TREATMENT OF METALS AND ALLOYS AND METHOD OF OBTAINING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 12.02.1992 [1992/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VSESOJUZNY NAUCHNO-ISSLEDOVATELSKY PROEKTNO-KONSTRUKTORSKY I TEKHNOLOGICHESKY INST. ELEKTROTERMICHESKOGO OBORUDOVANIA VNIIETO ul. Nizhegorodskaya, 29 Moscow 109052 / SU | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states VSESOJUZNY NAUCHNO-ISSLEDOVATELSKY PROEKTNO-KONSTRUKTORSKY I TEKHNOLOGICHESKY INSTITUT ELEKTROTERMICHESKOGO OBORUDOVANIA VNIIETO, ul. Nizhegorodskaya, 29 Moscow 109052 / SU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASILIEV, Sergei Zinovievich ul. Stroikovskaya, 12-2-25 Moscow, 109029 / SU | 02 /
TELNJUK, Jury Nikolaevich ul. Jubileinaya, 7a-47 Moskovskaya obl. Istra, 143500 / SU | 03 /
MAERGOIZ, Iosif Izrailevich per. Vasnetsova, 12-7 Moscow, 129090 / SU | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr. Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90902563.7 | 18.08.1989 | [1991/32] | WO1989SU00220 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9102695 | Date: | 07.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0439614 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SU | 07.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/38, C21D1/74, C23C8/20 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
C23C8/20 (EP);
C01B3/00 (EP);
C01B3/38 (EP);
C01B3/384 (EP);
C21D1/76 (EP);
C23C8/30 (EP);
C01B2203/0238 (EP);
C01B2203/06 (EP);
C01B2203/085 (EP);
C01B2203/1058 (EP);
C01B2203/1241 (EP);
C01B2203/1276 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | GASGEMISCH FÜR WÄRMECHEMISCHES BEHANDELN VON METALLEN UND LEGIERUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [1991/32] | English: | GAS MIXTURE FOR THERMO-CHEMICAL TREATMENT OF METALS AND ALLOYS AND METHOD OF OBTAINING IT | [1991/32] | French: | MELANGE GAZEUX DE TRAITEMENT THERMO-CHIMIQUE DE METAUX ET D'ALLIAGES ET SON PROCEDE D'OBTENTION | [1991/32] | File destroyed: | 15.03.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.1991 | Translation filed | 18.04.1991 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.1991 | Search fee paid | 18.04.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 08.11.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]SU680634 (MAXIMILIANSHUETTE EISENWERK [DE]); | [A]SU833469 (VASILEV SERGEJ Z [SU], et al); | [A]SU184281 ; | [A]US4191598 (CONYBEAR JAMES G [US], et al); | [A]PL138427B ; | [A]SU476339 ; | [A]FR2527641 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) | [A] - METALLURGIA, (Moscow), 1984, P.A. PROSHKIN, "Khimiko-Termicheskaya Abrabotka Metallov-Karbonitratsia"pages 214-216. | [A] - REFERATIVNY ZHURNAL, "Metallurgia", No. 8, 1977, (VINITI, Moscow), Ref. 8 I963, SIMIDZU DZJUGO, "Regulirovanie Atmosfery v Pechakh Dlya Termoobrabotki Metallov"; & KAISO, "Instrumentation", 1977, 20, No. 270-73 (Jap.). | [A] - REFERATIVNY ZHURNAL, "Tekhnologia Mashinostroenia", No. 6, 1980, (VINITI, Moscow), Ref 5 B241, "Opredelenie Optimalnoi Tekhnologii Termicheskoi Obrabotki Stalei"; & DUMITRESCU R., "Bul. Univ. BRASOV", 1978, (1979), A, 20-C195-202 (Rum). |