EP0416116 - SPINDLE CONTROL INSTRUCTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | ||
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Takao Estate Hachioji 2-502 469-4, Kobikimachi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193 / JP | 02 /
FUJIBAYASHI, Kentaro 2-8-6, Nishikubo Musashino-shi Tokyo 180 / JP | 03 /
MIYAKE, Masahiko Fanuc Dai-3 Vira-karamatsu 3527-1, Shibokusa Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90902701.3 | 01.02.1990 | [1991/11] | WO1990JP00130 | Priority number, date | JP19890042427 | 22.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4242789 | [1991/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9010261 | Date: | 07.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0416116 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/18 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
G05B19/182 (EP,US);
G05B19/408 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/11] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR SPINDELSTEUERUNG MITTELS STEUERBEFEHLS | [1991/11] | English: | SPINDLE CONTROL INSTRUCTION SYSTEM | [1991/11] | French: | SYSTEME D'INSTRUCTION DE COMMANDE DE BROCHE | [1991/11] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.1990 | Translation filed | 08.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.1990 | Search fee paid | 08.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 23.11.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS62237504 (FANUC LTD); | [A]JPS62236650 (FANUC LTD) |