Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9007936 | Global Dossier | 26.07.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | CA2047363 | 18.07.1991 | US46146190 | 17.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0832980 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2002 | B1 | EP0832980 | 01.04.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | CA2047363 | 18.07.1991 | US46146190 | 17.01.1990 | EP90902891 | 22.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0454781 | Global Dossier | 16.12.1998 | B1 | EP0454781 | 08.07.1992 | A4 | EP0454781 | 06.11.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9000445 | 22.01.1990 | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | CA2047363 | 18.07.1991 | US46146190 | 17.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2047363 | 03.07.2001 | C | CA2047363 | 19.01.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | CA2047363 | 18.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69032841T | 12.05.1999 | T2 | DE69032841D1 | 28.01.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9000445 | 22.01.1990 | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | US46146190 | 17.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2752788B | 18.05.1998 | B2 | JPH04504843 | 27.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | CA2047363 | 18.07.1991 | US46146190 | 17.01.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5837510 | 17.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US47205695 | 06.06.1995 | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | US46146190 | 17.01.1990 | US96503992 | 22.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5861290 | 19.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | US46146190 | 17.01.1990 | US96503992 | 22.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2859252B | Global Dossier | 17.02.1999 | B2 | JPH10179181 | 07.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | US46146190 | 17.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE174514T | 15.01.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | US46146190 | 17.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE219519T | 15.07.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | US46146190 | 17.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69033975T | 02.10.2002 | T2 | DE69033975D1 | 01.08.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | US46146190 | 17.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT92931 | 29.03.1996 | B | PT92931 | 31.07.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US30063789 | 23.01.1989 | US46146190 | 17.01.1990 | Type | Divisional application | EP0832980 |